NJ A3685 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2820
Note: Carry Foward to future S1847
Note: Carry Over of previous A3330
Note: Carry Over of previous S1197
Note: Carry Foward to future S1847
Note: Carry Over of previous A3330
Note: Carry Over of previous S1197
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows municipality to establish reserved parking zone on property adjacent to disabled person's residence.
Title
Allows municipality to establish reserved parking zone on property adjacent to disabled person's residence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3685 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A3685 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S964 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A3330 (Carry Over) 2018-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1197 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A3685 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S964 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A3330 (Carry Over) 2018-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1197 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3685 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3685_I1.HTM |