NJ A3683 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4)
Status: Passed on October 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.124.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4)
Status: Passed on October 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.124.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes parking privileges for certain healthcare workers who render care at patients' home residences.
Title
Authorizes parking privileges for certain healthcare workers who render care at patients' home residences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2416 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2416 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-04 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.124. |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0) |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Substituted for S2416 (1R) |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2416 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A3683 (2R)