NJ A3677 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous S2053

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S677 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires racial and ethnic impact statement for certain bills and regulations affecting sentencing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires racial and ethnic impact statement for certain bills and regulations affecting sentencing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16AssemblySubstituted by S677 (2R)
2017-02-27AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-04-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S677 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (64-2-2)
S2053 (Carry Over) 2014-05-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback