NJ A3648 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs installation of electric vehicle charging stations at service areas on State's toll roads.
Title
Directs installation of electric vehicle charging stations at service areas on State's toll roads.
Sponsors
Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Linda Stender [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-14 | Passed by the Assembly (47-28-3) | |
2011-02-17 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Cryan) | |
2011-02-03 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-03 | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2603 (Same As) 2011-02-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading