NJ A3626 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1420
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading without recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading without recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits release of personal identifying information of violent crime victims and witnesses under State's open public records law.
Title
Prohibits release of personal identifying information of violent crime victims and witnesses under State's open public records law.
Sponsors
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Arthur Barclay [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported without Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading without recommendation |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-0-3) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3626 (Carry Over) 2017-03-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading without recommendation
S2849 (Same As) 2017-03-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading without recommendation
S2849 (Same As) 2017-03-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading without recommendation