NJ A3618 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3959
Note: Carry Foward to future S2935
Note: Carry Over of previous S1745
Note: Carry Over of previous S2774
Note: Carry Foward to future S2935
Note: Carry Over of previous S1745
Note: Carry Over of previous S2774
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain local authorities to inspect, maintain, and repair fire hydrants in planned real estate developments.
Title
Requires certain local authorities to inspect, maintain, and repair fire hydrants in planned real estate developments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3618 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
A3618 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S494 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1745 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2774 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A3618 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S494 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1745 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2774 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3618 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3618_I1.HTM |