NJ A3618 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes requirements for sale of home baked goods or cottage foods. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes requirements for sale of home baked goods or cottage foods. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-09SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2016-12-19AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2016-12-12AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-04-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1768 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3292 (Same As) 2017-06-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback