NJ A3617 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S534

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Combined with A4884 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises penalties for certain violations of law by public movers and warehousemen.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises penalties for certain violations of law by public movers and warehousemen.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24AssemblyCombined with A4884 (ACS)
2018-03-12AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Same As/Similar To

S781 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S534 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback