NJ A360 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5249

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.153.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits consumer reporting agencies from charging certain fees related to security freezes on consumer reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits consumer reporting agencies from charging certain fees related to security freezes on consumer reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2786 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.153.
2018-10-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
2018-10-29SenateSubstituted for S2786
2018-09-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-12SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2018-04-12AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-1-0)
2018-03-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5249 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2786 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A360

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback