NJ A3582 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S2321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S2321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates State Highway Route 17 in Waldwick Borough as "Christopher Goodell Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates State Highway Route 17 in Waldwick Borough as "Christopher Goodell Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Substituted by S2321 |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2321 (Same As) 2015-05-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.57.