NJ A3555 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2850
Note: Carry Over of previous S3439
Note: Carry Over of previous A5038
Note: Carry Over of previous S3439
Note: Carry Over of previous A5038
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Statewide Rapid Response Emergency Group.
Title
Establishes Statewide Rapid Response Emergency Group.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3555 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S360 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3439 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5038 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S360 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3439 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5038 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3555 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3555_I1.HTM |