NJ A3532 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Approved P.L.2017, c.231.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for regulation of fantasy sports activities in New Jersey. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for regulation of fantasy sports activities in New Jersey. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1927 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-24SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.231.
2017-06-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-6)
2017-06-29SenateSubstituted for S1927 (SS)
2017-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-05-22AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (56-16-2)
2017-03-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-01-30AssemblyReported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-04-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1927 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by A3532 (ACS)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback