NJ A3526 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S608
Note: Carry Over of previous A3469
Note: Carry Over of previous A3469
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Upgrades simple assault to aggravated assault when committed against registered security officer.
Title
Upgrades simple assault to aggravated assault when committed against registered security officer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2092 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S608 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A3469 (Carry Over) 2022-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S608 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A3469 (Carry Over) 2022-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3526 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3526_I1.HTM |