NJ A3526 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4761
Note: Carry Over of previous S3201
Note: Carry Over of previous S3201
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain aspects of out-of-network arbitration process under the "Out-of-network Consumer Protection, Transparency, Cost Containment and Accountability Act."
Title
Revises certain aspects of out-of-network arbitration process under the "Out-of-network Consumer Protection, Transparency, Cost Containment and Accountability Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S820 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4761 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3201 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4761 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3201 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3526 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3526_I1.HTM |