NJ A3519 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1350
Note: Carry Over of previous A5221
Note: Carry Over of previous A5221
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S2564 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S2564 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Restorative Justice in Education Pilot Program" in Department of Education.
Title
Establishes "Restorative Justice in Education Pilot Program" in Department of Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] |
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S2564 (3R) |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3519 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S2564 (3R)
A5221 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2564 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.412.
A5221 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2564 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.412.