NJ A3499 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.209.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.209.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DMVA to encourage and facilitate returning service members' registration with VA.*
Title
Requires DMVA to encourage and facilitate returning service members' registration with VA.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2256 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.209. |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Substituted for S2256 (1R) |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2014-11-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2014-10-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2256 (Same As) 2015-12-07 - Substituted by A3499 (1R)