NJ A347 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved P.L.2014, c.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved P.L.2014, c.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to impose penalties on creditors that fail to timely remedy code violations of certain properties in foreclosure.*
Title
Authorizes municipalities to impose penalties on creditors that fail to timely remedy code violations of certain properties in foreclosure.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S288 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S288 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S288 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.5. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Substituted for S288 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-2-0) |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S288 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - Substituted by A347 (1R)