NJ A3461 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Substituted by S1974
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Substituted by S1974
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires petitions of nomination of candidates for State, county, school, or municipal elective public office to include functioning e-mail addresses therefor.
Title
Requires petitions of nomination of candidates for State, county, school, or municipal elective public office to include functioning e-mail addresses therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Substituted by S1974 |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1974 (Same As) 2018-07-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.66.