NJ A3443 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4782

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns licensure of persons possessing barbering license in another state or foreign country.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns licensure of persons possessing barbering license in another state or foreign country.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3006 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
2018-12-17SenateSubstituted for S3006
2018-12-03SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2018-10-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2018-09-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4782 (Carry Over) 2017-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S3006 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A3443 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback