NJ A3424 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous A1516
Note: Carry Over of previous S2323

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-03-10 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes certain program requirements for school counselor certification; outlines role and duties of school counselor; requires professional development for school counselors; establishes position of School Counselor Liaison in DOE.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes certain program requirements for school counselor certification; outlines role and duties of school counselor; requires professional development for school counselors; establishes position of School Counselor Liaison in DOE.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2025-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-03-10AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2024-02-01AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1784 (Same As) 2024-09-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1516 (Carry Over) 2023-06-05 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2323 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback