NJ A3381 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Substituted by S414 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school districts, charter schools, nonpublic schools, and contracted service providers to review employment history of prospective employees who will have regular contact with students to ascertain allegations of child abuse or sexual misconduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school districts, charter schools, nonpublic schools, and contracted service providers to review employment history of prospective employees who will have regular contact with students to ascertain allegations of child abuse or sexual misconduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15AssemblySubstituted by S414 (2R)
2018-02-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-12AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S414 (Same As) 2018-04-11 - Approved P.L.2018, c.5.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback