NJ A3367 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1030

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 27 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns installation of electric vehicle charging stations in common interest communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns installation of electric vehicle charging stations in common interest communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1951 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-2)
2020-08-27SenateSubstituted for S1951
2020-08-03SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-07-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2020-07-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-07-02AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
2020-02-25AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1951 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A3367
A1030 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2421 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback