NJ A3366 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2180

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires provisions regarding sellers' obligation to deliver marketable and insurable title in certain residential real estate contracts of sale.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires provisions regarding sellers' obligation to deliver marketable and insurable title in certain residential real estate contracts of sale.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2018-06-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-12AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2180 (Carry Over) 2016-06-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback