NJ A3350 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-13 - Substituted by S2183 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires PANYNJ be subject to NY Freedom of Information Law and NJ open public records act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires PANYNJ be subject to NY Freedom of Information Law and NJ open public records act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-11-13AssemblySubstituted by S2183 (1R)
2014-10-27AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-10-23AssemblyTransferred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2014-06-05AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2183 (Same As) 2015-06-26 - Approved P.L.2015, c.64.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback