NJ A3347 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.162.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes New Jersey School Safety Specialist Academy in Department of Education and requires school districts to designate school safety specialist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes New Jersey School Safety Specialist Academy in Department of Education and requires school districts to designate school safety specialist.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2242 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.162.
2017-06-22AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-2)
2017-06-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-06-19SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2017-06-19SenateSubstituted for S2242 (1R)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-06-20SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-06-20SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-04-18SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2016-04-07AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (68-0-5)
2016-03-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-02-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2242 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A3347 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback