NJ A334 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4787
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides dedicated funding for promotion of apprenticeships and apprenticeship programs from Workforce Development Partnership Fund.
Title
Provides dedicated funding for promotion of apprenticeships and apprenticeship programs from Workforce Development Partnership Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4787 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S1637 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S1637 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A334 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/334_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A334 |