NJ A332 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4785
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires issuance of one free copy of birth certificate for child born in New Jersey to active duty service member.
Title
Requires issuance of one free copy of birth certificate for child born in New Jersey to active duty service member.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Grace Spencer [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] |
Rep. Marlene Caride [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4785 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A1761 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.156.
S957 (Same As) 2016-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1761 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.156.
S957 (Same As) 2016-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A332 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/332_I1.HTM |