NJ A3306 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - Substituted by S1870 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes additional requirements, and penalties for failure to comply, concerning information to be provided to persons purchasing cats or dogs from pet shops. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes additional requirements, and penalties for failure to comply, concerning information to be provided to persons purchasing cats or dogs from pet shops. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-18AssemblySubstituted by S1870 (2R)
2014-12-15AssemblyAssembly Substitution (McGuckin)
2014-09-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-06-05AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1870 (Same As) 2015-02-05 - Approved P.L.2015, c.7.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback