NJ A3251 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1078
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Substituted by S332
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Substituted by S332
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes impoundment of all-terrain vehicles and dirt bikes for certain crimes and offenses.
Title
Authorizes impoundment of all-terrain vehicles and dirt bikes for certain crimes and offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] |
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Substituted by S332 |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S332 (Same As) 2018-07-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.65.
S1078 (Carry Over) 2016-09-29 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1078 (Carry Over) 2016-09-29 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee