NJ A3227 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4353
Note: Carry Over of previous S3186
Note: Carry Over of previous S3186
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee
Pending: Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee
Pending: Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Office of Ombudsman for Children.
Title
Establishes Office of Ombudsman for Children.
Sponsors
Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. Brian Bergen [R] | Rep. Gerard Scharfenberger [R] | Rep. Victoria Flynn [R] |
Rep. Dawn Fantasia [R] | Rep. Michele Matsikoudis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4353 (Carry Over) 2022-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S3186 (Carry Over) 2022-10-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2500 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3186 (Carry Over) 2022-10-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2500 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3227 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3500/3227_I1.HTM |