NJ A3217 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Combined with S2586/2587/A3218 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain sanitation procedures for mattresses and product labeling regarding such procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain sanitation procedures for mattresses and product labeling regarding such procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-09SenateCombined with S2586/2587/A3218 (SCS)
2014-12-15SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2014-12-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (65-10-1)
2014-10-02AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-05-15AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2587 (Same As) 2015-02-09 - Combined with S2586/A3217/3218 (SCS)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback