NJ A3186 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A974
Note: Carry Over of previous A770
Note: Carry Over of previous A770
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that trespassing in nuclear power plant is third degree crime.
Title
Provides that trespassing in nuclear power plant is third degree crime.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Rumpf [R] | Rep. DiAnne Gove [R] | Rep. Amy Handlin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3186 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A770 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S2961 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A770 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S2961 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee