NJ A317 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A553

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes certain requirements for domestic violence training for certain judges and judicial personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes certain requirements for domestic violence training for certain judges and judicial personnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-31SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-31SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-05-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2018-05-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-12AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A553 (Carry Over) 2016-10-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S115 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback