NJ A3165 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future S1122
Note: Carry Over of previous A3098
Note: Carry Over of previous A1973
Note: Carry Over of previous S1515

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases statutory mandatory retirement age for Supreme Court Justices, Superior Court Judges, Tax Court Judges, Administrative Law Judges, Workers' Compensation Judges and county prosecutors from 70 to 72.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases statutory mandatory retirement age for Supreme Court Justices, Superior Court Judges, Tax Court Judges, Administrative Law Judges, Workers' Compensation Judges and county prosecutors from 70 to 72.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-12AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2022-03-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3165 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3098 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A1973 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S1515 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback