NJ A3163 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3069
Note: Carryover of previous A3069

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-12-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides fair standards for elections and recall of officers for homeowners' associations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides fair standards for elections and recall of officers for homeowners' associations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-02-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3069 (Carry Over) 2015-06-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1805 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3069 (Carry Over) 2016-02-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback