NJ A3160 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3842
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.334.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.334.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits cosmetology and hairstyling school clinics to charge certain fees for services rendered to general public.
Title
Permits cosmetology and hairstyling school clinics to charge certain fees for services rendered to general public.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1751 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.334. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted for S1751 (1R) |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1751 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A3160 (1R)
A3842 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0)
A3842 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0)