NJ A3148 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3560
Note: Carry Foward to future S1351
Note: Carry Over of previous A2489
Note: Carry Foward to future S1351
Note: Carry Over of previous A2489
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows person with implanted medical device to voluntarily make notation on driver's license or identification card.*
Title
Allows person with implanted medical device to voluntarily make notation on driver's license or identification card.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3148 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3148 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1856 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2489 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A3148 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1856 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2489 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee