NJ A312 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A542

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-11-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.227.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain health care facilities to provide information concerning palliative care and hospice care services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain health care facilities to provide information concerning palliative care and hospice care services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2682 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.227.
2019-06-20SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2019-06-20SenateSubstituted for S2682 (2R)
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

A542 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2682 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A312 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback