NJ A3108 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1753
Note: Carry Foward to future S1666
Note: Carry Over of previous S805
Note: Carry Over of previous A2937
Note: Carry Foward to future S1666
Note: Carry Over of previous S805
Note: Carry Over of previous A2937
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies and enhances use of breach of implied warranty of habitability as defense to certain eviction actions.
Title
Codifies and enhances use of breach of implied warranty of habitability as defense to certain eviction actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3108 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3108 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S538 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S805 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2937 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A3108 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S538 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S805 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2937 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3108 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3108_I1.HTM |