NJ A3095 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Substituted by S2082 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The "Opioid Antidote and Overdose Prevention Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The "Opioid Antidote and Overdose Prevention Act."

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-21AssemblySubstituted by S2082 (1R)
2013-02-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-06-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2082 (Same As) 2013-05-02 - Approved P.L.2013, c.46.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback