NJ A3061 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain persons from HVACR licensing requirement; clarifies definition of heating, ventilating, air conditioning, and refrigeration.*
Title
Exempts certain persons from HVACR licensing requirement; clarifies definition of heating, ventilating, air conditioning, and refrigeration.*
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Rep. John Amodeo [R] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Sen. James Whelan [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Amend (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2576 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Amend (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2576 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Concur by Assembly Amendments (Prieto) (78-0-2) |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-14) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Substituted for S2576 (1R) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading without recommendation |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Labor Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Prieto) |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2576 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Substituted by A3061 (2R)