NJ A3049 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S323
Note: Carry Foward to future A3245
Note: Carry Over of previous A4216
Note: Carry Over of previous S2630
Note: Carry Foward to future A3245
Note: Carry Over of previous A4216
Note: Carry Over of previous S2630
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes prescription drug pricing disclosure requirements and measures to reduce prescription drug costs.
Title
Establishes prescription drug pricing disclosure requirements and measures to reduce prescription drug costs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3049 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A3049 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S234 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4216 (Carry Over) 2018-06-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S2630 (Carry Over) 2018-06-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3049 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S234 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4216 (Carry Over) 2018-06-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S2630 (Carry Over) 2018-06-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3049 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3049_I1.HTM |