NJ A304 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Approved P.L.2015, c.13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on February 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-05 - Approved P.L.2015, c.13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires schools to maintain supply of epinephrine and permit administration of epinephrine to any student having anaphylactic reaction.
Title
Requires schools to maintain supply of epinephrine and permit administration of epinephrine to any student having anaphylactic reaction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S801 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S801 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S801 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S801 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.13. |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-0) |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Substituted for S801 (2R) |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-5) |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S801 (Same As) 2014-12-18 - Substituted by A304 (3R)