NJ A3007 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3753
Note: Carry Over of previous A5285
Note: Carry Over of previous A5285
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts sales of investment metal bullion and certain investment coins from sales and use tax.
Title
Exempts sales of investment metal bullion and certain investment coins from sales and use tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1825 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5294 (1R)
S3753 (Carry Over) 2021-05-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5285 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3753 (Carry Over) 2021-05-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5285 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A3007 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3500/3007_I1.HTM |