NJ A3005 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Approved P.L.2010, c.21.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns certain taxes and assessments dedicated to the administrative costs of the DOBI.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns certain taxes and assessments dedicated to the administrative costs of the DOBI.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-29 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-29 Approved P.L.2010, c.21.
2010-06-28 Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-18)
2010-06-28 Emergency Resolution (33-3) (Cardinale)
2010-06-28 Substituted for S2096 (2R)
2010-06-28 Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2010-06-28 Passed by the Assembly (41-37-0)
2010-06-28 Emergency Resolution (Coyle) (78-0-0)
2010-06-28 Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Coyle)
2010-06-24 Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2010-06-24 Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2943 (Same As) 2010-06-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback