NJ A2991 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3827

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns local taxation of business personal property of local exchange telephone companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns local taxation of business personal property of local exchange telephone companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-19AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-02-20AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S421 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S3827 (Carry Over) 2019-05-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback