NJ A2943 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for voluntary contributions by taxpayers on gross income tax returns for active duty members of United States Armed Forces, Reserve components thereof, and National Guard from New Jersey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for voluntary contributions by taxpayers on gross income tax returns for active duty members of United States Armed Forces, Reserve components thereof, and National Guard from New Jersey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-14 - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
2015-05-14AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
2015-03-19AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-03-24AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1312 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback