NJ A2897 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1054
Note: Carry Over of previous S2326
Note: Carry Over of previous S2326
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers within construction industry to notify employees of certain rights.
Title
Requires employers within construction industry to notify employees of certain rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1054 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2326 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2758 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2326 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2758 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2897 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3000/2897_I1.HTM |