NJ A2878 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous S2190
Note: Carry Over of previous A1005

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Medicaid Transportation Brokerage Program Oversight and Accountability Act"; establishes vehicle, staffing, and performance standards, and review and reporting requirements for non-emergency medical transport provided under State's non-emergency medical transportation brokerage program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Medicaid Transportation Brokerage Program Oversight and Accountability Act"; establishes vehicle, staffing, and performance standards, and review and reporting requirements for non-emergency medical transport provided under State's non-emergency medical transportation brokerage program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-18AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2023-02-09AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Health Committee
2022-02-28AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1069 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2190 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1005 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback