NJ A2873 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A110
Note: Carry Over of previous S107
Note: Carry Over of previous A2466
Note: Legislation replaced by A1327
Note: Carry Over of previous S107
Note: Carry Over of previous A2466
Note: Legislation replaced by A1327
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - Combined with A1327 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - Combined with A1327 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises homestead property tax reimbursement eligibility requirements for certain claimants relocating homesteads within the same municipality.
Title
Revises homestead property tax reimbursement eligibility requirements for certain claimants relocating homesteads within the same municipality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Combined with A1327 (ACS) |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2873 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Combined with A1327 (ACS)
S1406 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S107 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2466 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A1327 (Replaced by) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
S1406 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S107 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2466 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A1327 (Replaced by) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2873 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3000/2873_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2873 |